Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Carlos Vera Plasencia, M.S.C.

Bishop of Peru, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1961 BornTrujillo
15 Aug 198423.1ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
22 Jul 198827.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
18 Jun 200544.0AppointedPrelate of Caravelí, Peru
28 Aug 200544.2Ordained BishopPrelate of Caravelí, Peru
16 Jul 201453.1AppointedBishop of Peru, Military
13 Sep 201453.2InstalledBishop of Peru, Military

MicroData Summary for Juan Carlos Vera Plasencia:
Bishop Juan Carlos Vera Plasencia M.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Peru, Military

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Peru, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,967
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2014
  • i: CB, 13 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Sep 2014