Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timoteo Solórzano Rojas, M.S.C.

Auxiliary Bishop of Trujillo, Peru

Titular Bishop of Dumium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1969 Born
15 Aug 199021.5First VowsMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
15 Aug 199829.5Perpetual VowsMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
9 Jan 200131.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
6 Nov 201849.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trujillo, Peru
6 Nov 201849.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dumium
5 Jan 201949.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dumium

MicroData Summary for Timoteo Solórzano Rojas
Bishop Timoteo Solórzano Rojas M.S.C. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChucos, Territorial Prelature of Huarí
Ordained BishopSanta Maria, Cathedral Basilica, Trujillo, Archdiocese of Trujillo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Trujillo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2018
  • c1: CB, 7 Nov 2018
  • ob: CB, 17 Nov 2018
  • c2+: CB, 29 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast