Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Gerardus Maria van Burgsteden, S.S.S.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Haarlem-Amsterdam

Titular Bishop of Thibilis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1935 BornAchterveld
15 Mar 196428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
24 Jun 200064.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
24 Jun 200064.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibilis
9 Sep 200064.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibilis
25 Oct 201175.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Haarlem-Amsterdam, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johannes Gerardus Maria van Burgsteden:
Bishop Johannes Gerardus Maria van Burgsteden S.S.S. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Haarlem-Amsterdam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Haarlem-Amsterdam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,833

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013