Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hendrik Joseph Alois Bomers, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Haarlem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1936BornGroenlo
19 Mar 196427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
17 Dec 197741.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gimma, Ethiopia
17 Dec 197741.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Avioccala
9 Jul 197842.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avioccala
19 Oct 198347.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
21 Oct 198347.5AppointedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
12 Sep 199862.4DiedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Hendrik Joseph Alois Bomers:
Bishop Hendrik Joseph Alois Bomers C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Haarlem

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Nov 2013