Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ludovico Van der Veen Zeppenfeldt, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Acholla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1891Born
15 Aug 191826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Nov 194857.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
11 Nov 194857.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Acholla
30 Dec 194857.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acholla
9 Dec 195665.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
4 Jul 195765.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ludovico Van der Veen Zeppenfeldt
Bishop Antonio Ludovico Van der Veen Zeppenfeldt O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Curaçao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOranjestadt

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast