Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Oomen, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mwanza

Titular Bishop of Zattara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1876BornGinneken, Netherlands
23 Mar 190125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
18 Mar 192953.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mwanza, Tanzania
18 Mar 192953.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Zattara
21 Jul 192953.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zattara
13 Jun 194872.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Mwanza, Tanzania
19 Aug 195781.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mwanza, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Anton Oomen:
Bishop Anton Oomen M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mwanza

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013