Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Franciskus Marie Sweens, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Victoria-Nyanza

Titular Bishop of Capsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1858Born’s Hertogenbosch, Netherlands
3 Jun 188224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
1 Jan 191051.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Southern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Meridionale}, Tanzania
1 Jan 191051.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsa
20 Jan 191051.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsa
12 Dec 191254.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Southern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Meridionale}, Tanzania
15 Jan 191556.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza, Tanzania
12 Nov 192870.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza, Tanzania
6 Apr 195092.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Victoria-Nyanza, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Joseph Franciskus Marie Sweens:
Bishop Joseph Franciskus Marie Sweens M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Victoria-Nyanza

  • a priest for 67.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 111
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013