Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelmus van de Ven

Deceased

Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1834Born
27 May 189258.0AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
17 Jul 189258.1Ordained BishopBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
22 Dec 191985.6DiedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Wilhelmus van de Ven (VIAF: 284982778)
Bishop Wilhelmus van de Ven (born , died ) Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchijndel, Diocese of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Cathedral, Bois-le-Duc, Diocese of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 165
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 97
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017