Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Justin Cawet

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Hemeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1866Born
6 Apr 188923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
28 Jan 192963.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
28 Jan 192963.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria
19 Mar 192963.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria
16 Oct 194175.7DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Paul Justin Cawet
Bishop Paul Justin Cawet (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Namur {Namen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHouffalize

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast