Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Joseph Faict

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1813BornLeffinghe
23 Dec 183724.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
9 Jun 183825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
22 Sep 186451.3AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
18 Oct 186451.4Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
4 Jan 189480.6DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean Joseph Faict:
Bishop Jean Joseph Faict (born , died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 159
  • c1+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014