Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas-Alexis Ondernard

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1756BornRambervillers, France
3 Apr 177922.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Jun 182871.9AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
28 Oct 182872.2Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
25 Mar 183174.6DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Nicolas-Alexis Ondernard (VIAF: 311816007)
Bishop Nicolas-Alexis Ondernard (born , died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016