Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luc d’Acquin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640¹Born
6 Jun 167434.4SelectedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
11 Jun 167434.4ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
12 Aug 167434.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
17 Mar 168141.2AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
1697²57.0ResignedBishop of Fréjus, France
2 Mar 171878.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Fréjus, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luc d’Acquin
Bishop Luc d’Acquin (born 1640, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvignon

  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 204, and Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast