Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simeon Oliveros Valerio, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Calapan, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Mimiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1918Born
16 Jun 194628.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
26 Nov 197355.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Calapan, Philippines
26 Nov 197355.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mimiana
26 Jan 197455.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mimiana
26 Sep 198870.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Calapan, Philippines
23 Jun 200385.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Calapan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Simeon Oliveros Valerio
Bishop Simeon Oliveros Valerio S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Calapan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBinmaley
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Church, Queson City

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • mn: CB, 25 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast