Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Credo Manuel, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Jose in Mindoro, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Albulae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1938Born
1 Dec 196830.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
17 Mar 198344.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Jose in Mindoro, Philippines
17 Mar 198344.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Albulae
29 Jun 198344.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Albulae
14 Oct 200061.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of San Jose in Mindoro, Philippines
18 Aug 200768.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Jose in Mindoro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Vicente Credo Manuel
Bishop Vicente Credo Manuel S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Jose in Mindoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalintaan

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • mn: CB, 15 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast