Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-François Bocaud (Boucaud)

Deceased

Bishop of Alet, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1685¹Born
26 Oct 172338.8SelectedBishop of Alet, France
14 Feb 172439.1ConfirmedBishop of Alet, France
11 Jun 172439.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alet, France
6 Dec 176277.9DiedBishop of Alet, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-François Bocaud (Boucaud)
Bishop Joseph-François Bocaud (Boucaud) (born 1685, died ) Bishop of Alet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontpellier

  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast