Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernst Friedrich von Twickel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

Titular Bishop of Botrys


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1683BornHavixbeck
23 Jan 170723.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Hildesheim, Germany
24 Dec 170724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
27 Sep 172441.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
27 Sep 172441.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
5 Nov 172441.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
17 Jan 173450.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ernst Friedrich von Twickel:
Bishop Ernst Friedrich von Twickel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015