Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Oesterhoff, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

Titular Bishop of Agathonice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1672BornMünster
1693²20.1ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
4 Apr 169926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
20 Dec 172351.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
20 Dec 172351.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathonice
2 Apr 172451.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathonice
20 Jan 174673.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
22 Oct 174875.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Oesterhoff:
Bishop Ferdinand Oesterhoff O. Cist. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015