Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Tommasiello

Deceased

Bishop of Teano-Calvi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1934Born
15 Aug 195925.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 198955.0AppointedBishop of Teano-Calvi, Italy
7 Oct 198955.2Ordained BishopBishop of Teano-Calvi, Italy
25 Oct 200571.3DiedBishop of Teano-Calvi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Tommasiello
Bishop Francesco Tommasiello (born , died ) Bishop of Teano-Calvi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolopaca

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,579
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast