Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philibert-Charles de Pas de Feuquières

Deceased

Bishop of Agde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1657³Bornl'Artois
15 Apr 170244.8SelectedBishop of Agde, France
31 Jul 170245.1ConfirmedBishop of Agde, France
10 Sep 170245.2Ordained BishopBishop of Agde, France
25 Jul 172669.0DiedBishop of Agde, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philibert-Charles de Pas de Feuquières:
Bishop Philibert-Charles de Pas de Feuquières (born , died ) Bishop of Agde

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015