Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Krysztof Hilary Szembek

Deceased

Bishop of Płock


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1722BornBiała
19 Mar 174826.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Poznań, Poland
24 Mar 174826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
3 Dec 176644.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Jun 176745.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Jun 176745.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
29 Sep 176745.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
9 Mar 177553.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Płock, Poland
29 May 177553.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Płock, Poland
14 Feb 178563.0SucceededBishop of Płock, Poland
14 Mar 178563.1InstalledBishop of Płock, Poland
5 Sep 179775.6DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Krysztof Hilary Szembek:
Bishop Krysztof Hilary Szembek (born , died ) Bishop of Płock

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 189, and Page 342
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 438
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016