Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Narzymski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Titular Bishop of Evaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1735³Born
18 Oct 175722.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Jun 175924.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 177843.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
20 Jul 177843.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
27 Sep 177843.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Evaria
10 Dec 179964.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoni Narzymski
Bishop Antoni Narzymski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiborg

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 211, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast