Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislaus Wykowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

Titular Bishop of Dioclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1700¹BornLutsk
28 Jul 172626.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Aug 172626.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Sep 177070.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
10 Sep 177070.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
2 Dec 177070.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
18 Apr 177878.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Stanislaus Wykowski:
Bishop Stanislaus Wykowski (born 1700, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 197, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,459
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015