Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Józef Hozjusz

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1674³BornKalksteinen
23 Feb 169823.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Mar 169823.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 171844.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
5 Dec 171844.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
23 Apr 171944.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
16 Sep 172045.8AppointedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
14 Jan 172247.1AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
19 Jan 173358.1AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
13 Oct 173863.8DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Józef Hozjusz:
Bishop Stanisław Józef Hozjusz (born , died ) Bishop of Poznań

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,451
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 138, and Page 401
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 408
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015