Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Stanisław Grabowski

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1698³BornGrabowo
11 Nov 173032.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gniezno, Poland
26 Nov 173032.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
22 Jun 173334.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
22 Jun 173334.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
16 Aug 173335.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
26 Sep 173638.2AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
12 Jan 173940.5SelectedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
15 Jul 173941.0ConfirmedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
2 May 174142.8SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
18 Sep 174143.1ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
8 Dec 174143.4InstalledBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
15 Dec 176668.4DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Stanisław Grabowski:
Bishop Adam Stanisław Grabowski (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 188, and Page 311
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 432, and Page 444
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015