Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konstantin Schütz von Holzhausen, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda

Titular Bishop of Mennith

Titular See: (Johann Philipp Franz)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1709BornHaßfurt
6 Nov 172920.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Mar 173525.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Sep 173525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Sep 175747.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
26 Sep 175747.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mennith
6 Nov 175748.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mennith
23 Sep 177565.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Konstantin Schütz von Holzhausen:
Bishop Konstantin Schütz von Holzhausen O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 286, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015