Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich (Karl Sigismund) Bibra, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fulda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1711BornBamberg
12 Nov 173019.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Mar 173523.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Apr 173523.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Oct 175948.1SelectedBishop of Fulda, Germany
24 Mar 176048.5ConfirmedBishop of Fulda, Germany
14 Sep 176049.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fulda, Germany
25 Sep 178877.0DiedBishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich (Karl Sigismund) Bibra:
Bishop Heinrich (Karl Sigismund) Bibra O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Fulda

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015