Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josephus Franciscus van der Stappen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Ioppe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1846Born
18 Sep 186923.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 189347.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
15 Jun 189347.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
16 Jul 189347.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
28 Jul 190862.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Josephus Franciscus van der Stappen (VIAF: 166714407)
Bishop Josephus Franciscus van der Stappen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnvers
Ordained BishopGrand Seminary, Malines, Archdiocese of Mechelen

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 323
  • c2+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017