Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petrus de Brabandere

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1828Born
21 May 185324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
18 May 189465.6AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
11 Jun 189465.7Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
31 Mar 189566.5DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Petrus de Brabandere (VIAF: 70464956)
Bishop Petrus de Brabandere (born , died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOyghem
Ordained BishopSt. Sauveur, Bruges, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 159
  • c2+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jun 2017