Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Stegmeier Schmidlin

Bishop of Villarrica, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1962 Born
3 Dec 198826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, Chile
7 Feb 200946.7AppointedBishop of Villarrica, Chile
19 Apr 200946.9Ordained BishopBishop of Villarrica, Chile

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Stegmeier Schmidlin
Bishop Francisco Javier Stegmeier Schmidlin (born ) Bishop of Villarrica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Ángeles

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Villarrica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,156

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast