Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petros Stefanou

Bishop of Syros (e Milos)

Apostolic Administrator of Crete {Candia}

Bishop of Santorini {Thira}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1963 BornErmupoli
26 Jun 199430.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Syros (e Milos), Greece
15 Jul 199531.9Ordained PriestPriest of Syros (e Milos), Greece
13 May 201450.7AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
13 May 201450.7AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
13 May 201450.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Crete {Candia}, Greece
2 Jul 201450.9Ordained BishopBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece

MicroData Summary for Petros Stefanou:
Bishop Petros Stefanou (born ) Bishop of Syros (e Milos)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Syros (e Milos).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2014
  • od/ob/c0+: CB, 13 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 14 May 2014