Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Jakob Senfft

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Vera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1645Born
10 Feb 166924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
14 Nov 169550.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
14 Nov 169550.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vera
27 Dec 169550.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vera
5 Dec 171873.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
7 Aug 172176.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Jakob Senfft
Bishop Johann Jakob Senfft (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSachsenhausen

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 411
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast