Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Karl von Franckenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Worms, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹Born
17 Aug 168366.6SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
17 May 168871.3ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
5 Sep 168871.6Ordained BishopBishop of Worms, Germany
29 Sep 169174.7DiedBishop of Worms, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Karl von Franckenstein
Bishop Johannes Karl von Franckenstein (born 1617, died ) Bishop of Worms

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFranckenstein

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 420
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast