Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Eustachy Szembek

Deceased

Bishop of Płock


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1697³BornGrodziecen
25 Feb 172022.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 May 172023.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 173639.5AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
31 Mar 173739.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm, Poland
7 Jun 175255.0SelectedBishop of Płock, Poland
29 Jan 175355.7ConfirmedBishop of Płock, Poland
1 Apr 175961.9DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Eustachy Szembek:
Bishop Józef Eustachy Szembek (born , died ) Bishop of Płock

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,383
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 162, and Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015