Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleksander Działyński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Titular Bishop of Axieri (Azieri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1693³BornZaluzevien
28 Mar 171623.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Feb 171723.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 173744.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
23 Dec 173744.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Axieri (Azieri)
15 May 173845.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Axieri (Azieri)
26 Dec 173946.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aleksander Działyński:
Bishop Aleksander Działyński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 22.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 112, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,042
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015