Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Tadeusz Kierski

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1706³BornBrisconisten
5 Apr 173428.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Apr 173428.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 173630.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
19 Nov 173630.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bolina
10 Feb 173730.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bolina
5 Mar 176861.9SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
16 May 176862.1ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
16 Jan 178376.7DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Tadeusz Kierski:
Bishop Józef Tadeusz Kierski (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 126, and Page 348
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015