Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michał Remigiusz Łaszewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Titular Bishop of Macri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1682¹Born
8 Sep 170725.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
12 Sep 170725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
2 Oct 173048.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
2 Oct 173048.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Macri
6 Dec 173048.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macri
2 Oct 174664.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michał Remigiusz Łaszewski
Bishop Michał Remigiusz Łaszewski (born 1682, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStendsitz

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 272, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast