Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduard Nécsey

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Nitra, Slovakia

Titular Archbishop of Velicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1892Born
30 Jun 191523.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 194351.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia
12 Mar 194351.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Velicia
16 May 194351.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Velicia
1949²56.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nitra, Slovakia
16 May 196876.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Velicia
19 Jun 196876.3DiedApostolic Administrator of Nitra, Slovakia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eduard Nécsey
Archbishop Eduard Nécsey (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Nitra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOslany

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast