Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Generoso Mattei

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1827Born
21 Dec 185023.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Jun 185123.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 189163.8AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
14 Jun 189163.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
9 Jan 190072.4DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Generoso Mattei (VIAF: 232990017)
Bishop Generoso Mattei (born , died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTivoli, Diocese of Tivoli
Ordained BishopS. Laurent in Damaso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 409
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017