Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Lazzareschi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gubbio, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Iconium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1835Born
7 Apr 186025.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 189156.3AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
14 Jun 189156.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
18 Mar 189560.1ResignedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
18 Mar 189560.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Syria
22 Jun 190368.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
23 Jan 191883.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Lazzareschi (VIAF: 209122673)
Archbishop Luigi Lazzareschi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gubbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Laurent in Damaso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 264, and Page 319
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 406
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017