Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Ferri

Deceased

Bishop of Satriano e Campagna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1709BornSassano
21 Jun 173324.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 175041.0AppointedBishop of Bitonto, Italy
1 Mar 175041.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bitonto, Italy
18 May 177061.3AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
Feb 177364.0DiedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Ferri:
Bishop Nicola Ferri (born ) Bishop of Satriano e Campagna

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 124, and Page 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013