Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolň Antonio Spínola, O.M. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Naupactus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1716BornGenova
2 Oct 173519.5ProfessedMember of Order of the Minims
14 Apr 173923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
20 Nov 176953.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
29 Apr 177054.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Naupactus

MicroData Summary for Nicolň Antonio Spínola:
Archbishop Nicolň Antonio Spínola O.M. (born ) Titular Archbishop of Naupactus

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 302
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015