Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Belmas

Deceased

Bishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1757Born
22 Dec 178124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Carcassonne, France
5 Oct 180043.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of [Aude (Constitutional), France]
26 Oct 180043.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of [Aude (Constitutional), France]
6 Jan 180143.4SucceededBishop of [Aude (Constitutional), France]
17 Apr 180244.6SelectedBishop of Cambrai, France
30 Apr 180244.7ConfirmedBishop of Cambrai, France
21 Jul 184183.9DiedBishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Belmas (VIAF: 9976987)
Bishop Louis Belmas (born , died ) Bishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Diocese of Carcassonne
Ordained BishopCathedral, Carcassonne, Diocese of Carcassonne
Death PlaceCambrai, Diocese of Cambrai

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 129
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast