Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Maxime Sedfaoui

Deceased

Bishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1863Born
29 Jun 188926.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 189633.1AppointedBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
29 Mar 189633.2Ordained BishopBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
27 Feb 192562.1DiedBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Maxime Sedfaoui (VIAF: 89413260)
Bishop Joseph-Maxime Sedfaoui (born , died ) Bishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAkmim
Ordained BishopCoptic, Church, Cairo

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 303
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017