Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barnabé Akscheislian

Deceased

Bishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1838Born
1862¹23.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 188647.8AppointedBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt
2 May 188647.9Ordained BishopBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt
16 May 189859.9DiedBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Barnabé Akscheislian
Bishop Barnabé Akscheislian (born , died ) Bishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstantinople
Ordained BishopArmenian, Cathedral, Constantinople

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 88
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017