Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théophile Antoine Kandelaft (Qandalift)

Deceased

Patriarchal Vicar of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon

Titular Bishop of Tripoli del Libano dei Siri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1837Born
2 Jun 188649.2AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
2 Jun 188649.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripoli del Libano dei Siri
2 Jun 188649.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripoli del Libano dei Siri
5 Aug 189861.4DiedPatriarchal Vicar of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Théophile Antoine Kandelaft (Qandalift)
Bishop Théophile Antoine Kandelaft (Qandalift) (born , died ) Patriarchal Vicar of Beirut {Bairut}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep
Ordained BishopSt. Georges, Beirut, Eparchy of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian)

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 1 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,750
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1888, Page 255
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017