Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Cyrillus Macaire

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1867Born
1891²23.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 189528.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
15 Mar 189528.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea Philippi
17 Apr 189528.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea Philippi
19 Jun 189932.3AppointedPatriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
30 May 190841.2ResignedPatriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
18 May 192154.2DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cyrillus Macaire (VIAF: 15766364)
Patriarch Cyrillus Macaire (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScenaineh

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 87, and Page 167
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 45
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017