Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guido Corbelli, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cortona

Titular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1841BornCortona
9 Oct 188847.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of
9 Oct 188847.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pelusium
28 Oct 188847.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pelusium
22 Jun 189655.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cortona, Italy
8 Aug 1901³60.4ResignedBishop of Cortona, Italy
31 Aug 190160.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
22 Jan 190361.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Cortona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guido Corbelli:
Archbishop Guido Corbelli O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cortona

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 228, and Page 301
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 445

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013