Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Galea-Curmi

Auxiliary Bishop of Malta

Titular Bishop of Cebarades


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1964 Born
5 Jul 199127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Malta
23 Jun 201854.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta
23 Jun 201854.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cebarades
4 Aug 201854.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cebarades

MicroData Summary for Joseph Galea-Curmi
Bishop Joseph Galea-Curmi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Malta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalzan, Archdiocese of Malta
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Cathedral, Mdina, Archdiocese of Malta

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Malta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Jun 2018
  • c34: CB, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast