Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lothar Friedrich von Nalbach

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Emmaüs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1691³Born
11 Apr 171927.8Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
2 Oct 173039.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
2 Oct 173039.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
31 Dec 173039.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
11 May 174856.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lothar Friedrich von Nalbach
Bishop Lothar Friedrich von Nalbach (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrier, Archdiocese of Trier
Ordained BishopCathedral, Trier, Archdiocese of Trier

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 208, and Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 45
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast