Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christian Albert Anton von Merle

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sinope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1693Born
9 Jul 173037.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
23 Jul 173037.1Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
12 Apr 173440.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany
12 Apr 173440.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
21 Sep 173441.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
2 Mar 176571.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany

MicroData Summary for Christian Albert Anton von Merle
Bishop Christian Albert Anton von Merle (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWetzlar

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 381, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast